IL SB3392 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Installment Sales Contract Act. Excludes from the scope of the term "installment sales contract" a financing arrangement for the transfer of residential real estate that for religious or cultural reasons does not allow for the imposition or collection of interest. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INSTALLMENT SALE NO INTEREST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2018-05-16HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-09HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2018-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
765675Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback