IL SB3392 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Installment Sales Contract Act. Excludes from the scope of the term "installment sales contract" a financing arrangement for the transfer of residential real estate that for religious or cultural reasons does not allow for the imposition or collection of interest. Effective immediately.
Title
INSTALLMENT SALE NO INTEREST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0626 |
2018-07-20 | Senate | Effective Date July 20, 2018 |
2018-07-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 67 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |