IL SB3390 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Prohibits an employer from: (i) screening job applicants based on their wage or salary history, (ii) requiring that an applicant's prior wages satisfy minimum or maximum criteria, and (iii) requesting or requiring as a condition of being interviewed or as a condition of continuing to be considered for an offer of employment that an applicant disclose prior wages or salary. Prohibits an employer from seeking the salary, including benefits or other compensation or salary history, of a job applicant from any current or former employer, with some exceptions. Limits defenses. Provides for penalties and injunctive relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EQUAL PAY ACT-WAGE HISTORY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82011210Amended CodeCitation Text
82011230Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback