IL SB3387 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Provides that limitations on certain civil penalties shall not apply to civil penalties assessed under the Video Gaming Act. Provides that, in determining whether to grant an owners license to an applicant, the Illinois Gaming Board shall consider the extent to which the applicant considers veterans of the armed forces of the United States for employment. Requires the Board, by rule, to establish goals for the award of contracts by each owners licensee to businesses owned by veterans of service in the armed forces of the United States, expressed as percentages of an owners licensee's total dollar amount of contracts awarded during each calendar year. Removes provisions concerning the distribution of certain funds into the Horse Racing Equity Fund. Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board shall not grant an application to become a licensed video gaming location if the Board determines that granting the application would more likely than not cause a terminal operator licensed video gaming location to operate the video gaming terminals in 2 or more licensed video gaming locations as a single video gaming operation. Provides factors to be considered by the Board in determining restrictions on licenses in malls. Changes the non-refundable license application fee for terminal handlers from $50 to $100. Adds provisions providing that the non-refundable license application fee for certain licenses shall be $100. Provides that all current supplier licensees under the Riverboat Gambling Act shall be entitled to licensure under the Video Gaming Act as manufacturers, distributors, or suppliers without additional Board investigation or approval, except by vote of the Board. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMING-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-07HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-001-001
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Syverson
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 013-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Gaming; 012-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Gaming
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2301013Amended CodeCitation Text
230105Amended CodeCitation Text
230107Amended CodeCitation Text
230107.6Amended CodeCitation Text
2304025Amended CodeCitation Text
2304027Amended CodeCitation Text
2304045Amended CodeCitation Text
2304080Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback