IL SB3378 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Toxic-Free Kids Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish, maintain, post on its website, review, revise, and update a list of high priority chemicals of concern for children's health when used in children's products. Provides that a manufacturer of a children's product that contains a chemical included on the list in an amount at or above a de minimis level shall provide notice to the Department. Allows the Department to enter into reciprocal data sharing agreements with other states. Provides that if manufacturers of children's products substitute a chemical on the list for another chemical, the manufacturer must submit a hazard assessment to the Department that explains how the children's product is inherently less hazardous than before the substitution was made. Provides waivers and exemptions from the Act's requirements. Except for notice violations, establishes a civil penalty not to exceed $5,000 for a first violation or $10,000 for a subsequent violation. For notice violations, establishes a civil penalty of $2,500 for a first violation and $5,000 for a subsequent violation. Contains other provisions. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the High Priority Chemicals of Concern for Children's Health Fund as a special fund in the State treasury.
Title
TOXIC-FREE KIDS
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3378&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3378.htm |