IL SB3375 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Defines "probation officer". Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board may initiate, administer, and conduct firearm certification courses for probation officers. Effective immediately.
Title
POLICE TRAIN-PROBATION OFFICER
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-02-26 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 10.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |