IL SB3374 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
PEN CD-DOWNST TEACHER-SHORTAGE
Sponsors
Sen. John Sullivan [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 013-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-101.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |