IL SB3369 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that the tax imposed on the privilege of operating motor vehicles that use liquefied natural gas is 21.5 cents per gallon. Provides that, in the case of liquefied natural gas, "gallon" means a diesel gallon equivalent. Contains definitions. Amends the Weights and Measures Act. Provides that liquefied natural gas used as motor fuel shall be sold in diesel gallon equivalents, and compressed natural gas shall be sold in either gasoline gallon equivalents or diesel gallon equivalents.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-NATURAL GAS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 470 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 470 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 1.13C | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 1.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 1.8A | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |