IL SB3366 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates the amount of $536,400 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for a grant to Connections for Abused Women and their Children. Effective July 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DCEO-WOMEN AND CHILDREN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2024-06-26SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2024-02-20SenateAssigned to Appropriations
2024-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2024-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Lakesia Collins

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback