IL SB3359 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, upon the transfer of a film production services credit, the taxpayer shall pay to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity 1.5% of the credit amount, which shall be deposited into the Film Workforce Training and Diversity Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Film Workforce Training and Diversity Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used to provide grants to certain organizations and institutions to administer workforce development and training programs that support efforts to recruit, hire, promote, retain, develop, and train a diverse and inclusive workforce in the film industry. Effective immediately.
Title
FILM CREDIT-TRANSFER
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3359&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3359.htm |