IL SB3359 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Department of Natural Resources Real Property Return Authorization Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources is authorized to convey the right, title, and interest held by the Department in the real property formerly contemplated to comprise the Prairie Winds Trail in Moultrie County and Douglas County.
Title
DNR-REAL PROPERTY RETURN
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3359&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3359.htm |