IL SB3357 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-12 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Kratom Consumer Protection Act. Requires dealers of kratom products to disclose specified information. Provides that dealers shall not prepare, distribute, sell, or expose for sale: kratom products or kratom-containing products that meet specified criteria; or any kratom product to an individual who is under 18 years of age. Provides penalties and establishes a private cause of action for violations of the Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt rules for the administration and enforcement of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

KRATOM CONSUMER PROTECTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-12SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2020-03-04SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2020-02-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2020-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback