IL SB3343 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
Pending: Senate Appropriations I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $4,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Children and Family Services for grants to assist the Illinois Association of Court Appointed Special Advocates in its efforts to advocate for timely placement of children in permanent, safe, stable homes. Effective July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DCFS-CT OF SPECIAL ADVOCATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2020-02-25SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2020-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback