IL SB3337 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable year 2016 and thereafter, the amount of the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption shall be the greater of (i) the amount of the exemption otherwise calculated under that Section of the Code or (ii) $2,000. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-29SenateSent to the Governor
2016-12-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2016-12-01SenateSenate Concurs
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2016-12-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2016-12-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
2016-12-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-11-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2016-11-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2016-11-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - December 1, 2016
2016-11-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2016-11-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2016-11-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2016-11-30House3/5 Vote Required
2016-11-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2016-11-30HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2016-11-30HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2016-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-28HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2016-06-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
2016-05-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-18HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-003-000
2016-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-05-18HouseRemains in Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-05-18HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-001-000
2016-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-05-13HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
2016-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-12HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2016-05-11HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2016-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-04-21HouseArrived in House
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2016-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2016-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2016-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2016-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2016-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2016-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2016-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2016-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016
2016-04-14SenateSecond Reading
2016-04-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2016-03-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2016-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2016-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2016
2016-03-16SenateDo Pass Revenue; 010-000-000
2016-03-08SenateAssigned to Revenue
2016-02-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-19SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-19SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3337&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3337.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3337eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3337enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3337ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3337ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB3337_04212016_124000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900SB3337_11302016_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB3337_12012016_017001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB3337_12012016_017000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback