IL SB3336 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0863
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0863
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Requires pharmacies to establish and maintain a quality assurance program designed to prevent dispensing errors as well as a process designed to detect and identify dispensing errors. Requires pharmacies to commence an investigation into any detected dispensing errors within 2 days after the date the dispensing error is discovered. Requires that if an investigation into a dispensing error indicates that the dispensing error is attributable, in whole or in part, to the pharmacy or its personnel, that a quality assurance review be performed. Provides requirements for the quality assurance review and its records. Provides that the records of the quality assurance review shall not be subject to discovery in any arbitration, civil, or other proceeding, except in certain circumstances. Effective 12 months after becoming law.
Title
PHARMACY-QUALITY ASSURANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0863 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date August 19, 2016 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2016-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-16 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Righter |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Asignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |