IL SB3304 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Fire Protection Training Act. Provides that the Office of the State Fire Marshal (rather than, not later than May 30th of each year, from funds appropriated for this purpose) shall reimburse the local governmental agencies or individuals participating in the training program in an amount equaling one-half of the total sum paid by them during the period established by the Office for tuition at training schools, salary of trainees while in school, necessary travel expenses, and room and board for each trainee from funds appropriated for this purpose. Provides that if a National Fire Protection Association standard exists for various criteria identified under the Act, the Office shall utilize and adopt, by procedures, directives, or rules that standard or those standards as the minimum standard requirements for that criteria. Provides that the Office shall establish procedures for the adoption of those applicable National Fire Protection Association standards. Provides that the Office may, in its discretion, adopt, amend, and repeal in part or in their entirety those procedures, directives, or rules as may be necessary to carry out the Act. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GVT-FIRE PROTECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5074010Amended CodeCitation Text
5074011Amended CodeCitation Text
5074012Amended CodeCitation Text
5074013Amended CodeCitation Text
507402Amended CodeCitation Text
507407Amended CodeCitation Text
507408Amended CodeCitation Text
507409Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback