IL SB3303 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that if the respondent fails to appear on the date the court conducts an inquiry related to the discharge of a bond, the court may proceed with the inquiry and resolve any questions that arise.
Title
CIV PRO-BODY ATTACHMENT: BOND
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 12-107.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3303&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3303.htm |