IL SB3297 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0970
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0970
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Housing is Recovery Pilot Program Act. Provides that an individual is eligible to receive a Housing is Recovery bridge rental subsidy for purposes of stabilizing his or her mental illness or substance use disorder if: (1) the individual is at high risk of unnecessary institutionalization who is 18 (rather than 21) years of age or older, or is aging out of guardianship under the Department of Children and Family Services, and who is eligible to enroll in, or is enrolled in, Medicaid for purposes of receiving mental health treatment; or (2) an individual at high risk of overdose who is 18 (rather than 21) years of age or older, or is aging out of guardianship under the Department of Children and Family Services, and who is eligible to enroll in, or is enrolled in, Medicaid for purposes of receiving substance use treatment.
Title
HOUSING IS RECOVERY-18
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Simmons [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Rep. Yolanda Morris [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0970 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-001 |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-002-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 125 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |