IL SB3295 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure regarding a pleading or other document verified by certification. Provides that the pleading or other document may be used in the same manner as though sworn under oath without any further requirement that the document be sworn before an authorized person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PLEADING VERIFY CERTIFICATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-16HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-09HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73551-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback