IL SB3291 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to grant to the City of Aurora a modification to a Class V Non-Hazardous Underground Injection Control Area Permit regarding disposal of lime residual if the permit was previously granted and other specified criteria are met. Provides that the City of Aurora is entitled to previous waivers, is allowed to transport lime residual from the water treatment site to the injection site by truck without a manifest, and shall receive a modified permit allowing the construction requirements of the system to change and alterations to be performed upon the permitted facility.
Title
EPA-PERMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |