IL SB3291 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act. Defines "unmanned aircraft systems". Provides that regulation of unmanned aircraft systems is an exclusive power and function of the State. Restricts home rule power. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNMANNED AIRCRAFT SYSTEMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Clayborne
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
620542.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback