IL SB3288 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Property Control Act. Provides that the Board of Trustees of any public institution of higher education in this State is authorized to dispose of surplus real estate of that public institution of higher education. Specifies the manner in which a Board of Trustees may dispose of surplus real estate. Provides that a Board of Trustees may retain the proceeds from the sale, lease, or other transfer of all or any part of the real estate deemed surplus real estate in a separate account in the treasury of the institution for the purpose of deferred maintenance and emergency repair of institution property. Requires the Auditor General to examine the separate account to ensure the use or deposit of the proceeds in a manner consistent with the stated purpose. Defines "public institution of higher education". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNIVERSITY-SURPLUS REAL ESTATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
306057.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback