IL SB3285 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Home Grown Business Opportunity Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall develop an economic plan to assist businesses and municipalities located geographically close to bordering states. Provides that the plan shall take into account relevant economic data, including input from local economic development officials, and identify and develop specific strategies for utilizing the assets of those regions of the State located geographically close to bordering states, so that those regions may compete economically with bordering states. Requires the plan to include certain economic assessments, recommendations, and resources relevant to assisting businesses and municipalities located near bordering states. Requires that the information and resources collected and established under the plan shall be available to the public and posted on the Department's Internet website. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOME GROWN BUSINESS OPP ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000
2018-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback