IL SB3285 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that insurers shall collect a $1 surcharge upon each vehicle covered by a liability insurance policy. Provides that of the moneys collected by this surcharge, 72% shall be used for homeland security initiatives established by the Illinois Law Enforcement Alarm System (ILEAS) Governing Board, 25% shall be used for airborne operations, and 3% shall be retained by the Illinois Emergency Management Agency to be used to administer the Illinois Law Enforcement Alarm Systems Fund. Provides that the Illinois Emergency Management Agency shall establish guidelines for the expenditure of collected moneys to enhance local law enforcement homeland security and local law enforcement mutual aid activities in this State and to support public safety airborne operations. Provides that the ILEAS Governing Board shall annually supply the Director of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency with a report of the use of the surcharges. Amends the Intergovernmental Cooperation Act to provide that the Illinois Law Enforcement Alarm System shall be considered a public agency for purposes of the Act.
Title
VEH-CD SECURITY SURCHARGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Motion Prevailed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Motion Filed Sen. Michael W. Frerichs; to Table this bill. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 220 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-601.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |