IL SB3276 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 051-064-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that if the defendant is arraigned on or after the effective date of the bill, and the court fails to advise the defendant before the acceptance of a plea of guilty, guilty but mentally ill, or nolo contendere to a misdemeanor or felony offense, that "if you are not a citizen of the United States, you are hereby advised that conviction of the offense for which you have been charged may have the consequences of deportation, exclusion from admission to the United States, or denial of naturalization under the laws of the United States," and the defendant shows that conviction of the offense to which the defendant pleaded guilty, guilty but mentally ill, or nolo contendere may have the consequence for the defendant of deportation, exclusion from admission to the United States, or denial of naturalization under the laws of the United States, the court, upon the defendant's motion, shall vacate the judgment and permit the defendant to withdraw the plea of guilty, guilty but mentally ill, or nolo contendere and enter a plea of not guilty. Provides that the motion shall be filed within 2 years of the date of the defendant's conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-ALIEN ADVISEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 51 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Lost 051-064-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255113-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback