IL SB3268 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $3,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Supreme Court for probation reimbursements and training for probation officers, with regard to pre-trial services and other operational expenses in support of bail reform for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018. Appropriates $7,500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Supreme Court for probation reimbursements and training for probation officers, with regard to pre-trial services and other operational expenses in support of bail reform for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$SUPREME CT-BAIL REFORM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback