IL SB3265 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall conduct an access to nutritious food program to establish and operate projects and strategies within food deserts that focus on: (1) distribution of fresh and nutritious food; and (2) education in food preparation and nutrition. Provides that the Department shall promote the sharing of information concerning best practices and programs, including specified projects, that have proven to be effective in improving distribution of fresh and nutritious food and education in food preparation and nutrition. Provides that the Department shall convene an annual meeting of nonprofit organizations and other interested parties to share best practices and information on programs, including specified projects, that have proven to be effective in improving distribution of fresh and nutritious food and education in food preparation and nutrition. Defines "food desert" and "program".
Title
ACCESS TO NUTRITION PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-03 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 012-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |