IL SB3263 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0808
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0808
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the bill, the Director of State Police shall not appoint auxiliary State policemen. Repeals provisions concerning auxiliary State policemen to make conforming changes.
Title
STATE POLICE-AUXILIARY POLICE
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] |
Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0808 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |