IL SB3261 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abandoned Mobile Homes Act. Repeals and deletes provisions authorizing a municipality to remove and dispose of an abandoned mobile home within the municipality upon notice to each owner and each lienholder and provisions regarding various matters relating to the removal or disposal of an abandoned mobile home. Adds provisions authorizing a mobile home park owner or operator to commence a proceeding seeking a declaration by a court that a manufactured home has been abandoned and seeking removal of the manufactured home if specified conditions are met. Also adds provisions regarding: procedure; execution of judgments; disposition of property; responsibility for costs; and other matters. Defines "manufactured home resident" and "manufactured home owner". Makes corresponding changes in the Mobile Home Local Services Tax Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABANDONED MOBILE HOMES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21011710Amended CodeCitation Text
21011710.1New CodeSee Bill Text
21011715Repealed CodeCitation Text
21011720Repealed CodeCitation Text
21011725Repealed CodeCitation Text
21011730Repealed CodeCitation Text
21011735Repealed CodeCitation Text
21011740Repealed CodeCitation Text
21011745Repealed CodeCitation Text
2101175Amended CodeCitation Text
21011750Repealed CodeCitation Text
21011755Repealed CodeCitation Text
210117Act titleAmended CodeCitation Text
3551511Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-117.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback