IL SB3256 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides a person subject to bail under the Code for a Category B offense shall have $30 deducted from his or her monetary bail every day the person is incarcerated. Provides any sum of money deposited by any person to secure his or her release from custody which remains unclaimed by the person entitled to its return for 3 years after the conditions of the bail bond have been performed and the accused has been discharged from all obligations in the cause shall be presumed to be abandoned and subject to disposition under the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Eliminates publishing requirements and other provisions concerning unclaimed bail deposits. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-UNCLAIMD BAIL DEPOSIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0606
2018-07-16SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-07-16SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-06-06SenateSent to the Governor
2018-06-04SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-06-04SenateMotion Withdrawn Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-31SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 040-010-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-002-001
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Extended Debate - Passed 072-044-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Extended Debate
2018-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255110-14Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3256&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3256.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3256eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3256enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0606.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3256ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3256ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3256_04262018_034000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3256_05302018_045000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3256ham001_05312018_062000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback