IL SB3255 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Defines "Pre-Hospital Physician Assistant" or "PHPA". Includes Pre-Hospital Physician Assistants in the definition of "Emergency Medical Services Personnel". Adds PHPAs to provisions concerning licensing and educational requirements. Provides than an EMS Medical Director may immediately suspend a PHPA for specified reasons. Adds a PHPA to the State Emergency Medical Services Disciplinary Review Board. Adds PHPAs to provisions concerning misrepresentation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMS PERSONNEL-PHYSICIAN ASSIST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210503.165Amended CodeCitation Text
210503.35Amended CodeCitation Text
210503.40Amended CodeCitation Text
210503.45Amended CodeCitation Text
210503.5Amended CodeCitation Text
210503.50Amended CodeCitation Text
210503.65Amended CodeCitation Text
210503.80Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback