IL SB3254 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Executive Order 3 (2017) Implementation Act. Implements and supersedes Executive Order 3 (2017). Provides that all powers, duties, rights, and responsibilities of the Office of Coal Development and Marketing established in accordance with the Energy Conservation and Coal Development Act under the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity are transferred to the Department of Natural Resources. Makes corresponding changes to various Acts. Effective immediately.
Title
EO 3 (2017) IMPLEMENTATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1105 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1105 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1108 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1110 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1110 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1110 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 801 | 80-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 730 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 730 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 30 | 15-5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 355 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |