IL SB3249 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Balanced Budget Note Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to the textbook block grant program, provides that the textbooks authorized to be purchased must accurately portray the diversity of our society, including the role and contributions of people protected under the Illinois Human Rights Act, and must be non-discriminatory as to certain characteristics under the Act. Provides that the teaching of history of the United States in public schools shall include a study of the role and contributions of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people in the history of this country and this State. Requires every public elementary school and high school to include in its curriculum a unit of instruction studying the significant role of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender individuals in society. Specifies instruction requirements. Requires the regional superintendent of schools to monitor a school district's compliance with the curriculum requirements. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-LGBT-UNIT OF INSTRCTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2018-05-18HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2018-05-18HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-05-18HouseJudicial Note Filed
2018-05-18HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2018-05-18HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-17HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-006-000
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 034-018-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-002-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-000-003
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Education; 009-002-000
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.155Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-21Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-23.11New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback