IL SB3249 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the textbook block grant program, provides that the textbooks authorized to be purchased must accurately portray the diversity of our society, including the role and contributions of people protected under the Illinois Human Rights Act, and must be non-discriminatory as to certain characteristics under the Act. Provides that the teaching of history of the United States in public schools shall include a study of the role and contributions of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people in the history of this country and this State. Requires every public elementary school and high school to include in its curriculum a unit of instruction studying the significant role of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender individuals in society. Specifies instruction requirements. Requires the regional superintendent of schools to monitor a school district's compliance with the curriculum requirements. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
SCH CD-LGBT-UNIT OF INSTRCTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019 |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2018-05-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2018-05-22 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2018-05-21 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2018-05-18 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2018-05-18 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2018-05-18 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-18 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2018-05-18 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2018-05-18 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-17 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-006-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-018-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-002-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-000-003 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-002-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-23.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |