IL SB3249 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Collateral Recovery Act. Defines "automobile rental company". Provides that the Act does not apply to an automobile rental company or the employee of an automobile rental company when engaged in an activity otherwise covered by the Act if the activity is conducted by the employee on behalf of that automobile rental company. Provides that the Act does not apply to a towing company or towing operator when an employee or agent of an automobile rental company is present at the site from which the vehicle is towed. Provides that the Act does not apply to persons engaged in the recovery of collateral that is incidental to and within the scope of the person's primary business purpose and the primary business purpose is other than repossession. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
COLLATERAL RECOVERY-RENTAL CO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0708 |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2012 |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-001 |
2012-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2012-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 29, 2012 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 422 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 422 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |