IL SB3247 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to make certain real estate conveyances in Bureau County, Menard County, and Pulaski County, subject to specified conditions. Authorizes the Department of Transportation to make certain real estate conveyances in Grundy County, DuPage County, DeKalb County, Montgomery County, Tazewell County, and Mason County, subject to specified conditions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOT/DNR: LAND TRANSFER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-11-28SenateSenate Concurs
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 29, 2018
2018-11-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-11-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-11-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-000
2018-11-27House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-11-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-11-14SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-11-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
2018-06-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fowler
2018-04-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3247&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3247.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3247eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3247enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3247sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3247ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3247ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3247_04242018_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3247_11272018_018000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3247ham002_11282018_026000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback