IL SB3246 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Oil and Gas Act, and the Illinois Petroleum Education and Marketing Act. Transfers the administration of the Landowner Grant Program from the Department of Natural Resources to the Illinois Petroleum Resources Board. Provides that the Department has the power to transfer an amount not to exceed $250,000 per fiscal year from the Plugging and Restoration Fund to the Board for the sole purpose of implementing the Landowner Grant Program. Provides that the Board shall keep accurate records of all financial transactions regarding such funds. Establishes the Board's specific powers and duties in administering the Landowner Grant Program and utilizing the funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LANDOWNER GRANT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-17HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22572519.6Amended CodeCitation Text
22572815Amended CodeCitation Text
22572860New CodeSee Bill Text
22572865New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback