IL SB3241 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Re-Entering Citizens Civics Education Act. Expands the program to persons committed to a Department of Juvenile Justice facility. Provides that the workshop held at the Department of Juvenile Justice shall consist of 270 minutes of instruction. Provides that the civil education program in the Department of Juvenile Justice shall be taught by 2 co-facilitators. Provides that one of the co-facilitators shall be a member of an established nonpartisan civil organization and the other a committed person at the Department of Juvenile Justice who is specifically trained in voting rights education and who has been trained by an established nonpartisan civil organization. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
RE-ENTER CITIZENS CIV ED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 200 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 200 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 200 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 200 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 200 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 200 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 200 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 200 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3241&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3241.htm |