IL SB3241 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall issue distinctive registration plates for covered farm vehicles. Provides that a $10 surcharge shall be collected, in addition to all applicable fees, for the issuance of a registration plate. Provides that the surcharge shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that a designation as a covered farm vehicle shall not limit the purposes for which that vehicle may otherwise be used. Makes a corresponding change to the definition of "covered farm vehicle". Effective immediately.
Title
DISTINCT PLATE-COVERED FARM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0734 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18b-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-412 | Amended Code | Citation Text |