IL SB3241 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall issue distinctive registration plates for covered farm vehicles. Provides that a $10 surcharge shall be collected, in addition to all applicable fees for the issuance of a registration plate. Provides that the surcharge shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that a designation as a covered farm vehicle shall not limit the purposes for which that vehicle may otherwise be used. Modifies the definition of "covered farm vehicle". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISTINCT PLATE-COVERED FARM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0734
2018-08-03SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625518b-101Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-412Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback