IL SB3239 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013. Provides that for a specialized mental health rehabilitation facility licensed under the Act by December 1, 2017 or provisionally licensed under the Act by December 1, 2017, a payment shall be made for therapeutic visits that have been indicated by an interdisciplinary team as therapeutically beneficial. Provides that the payment shall be at a rate of 100% of the facility's rate on the effective date of the amendatory Act for the first 5 days. Provides that, thereafter, payment for a therapeutic visit shall be at 75% of the facility's rate on the effective date of the amendatory Act and may not exceed 30 days in a fiscal year and shall not exceed 10 days consecutively. Provides that payment to a facility for a therapeutic visit shall be available to the facility through both fee-for-service and managed care payment arrangements. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPECIALIZED MENTAL HEALTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-004-000
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210495-104New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback