IL SB3237 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0943
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0943
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. In provisions concerning investigative reports and findings issued by the Department of Human Services' Office of the Inspector General concerning abuse allegations involving Department employees and clients, provides that any request for reconsideration or clarification of the Inspector General's findings shall be conducted by an investigator or supervisor who did not participate in the investigation for which reconsideration or clarification is sought. Provides that after a reconsideration has been completed, the agency, victim or guardian, or the subject employee has 30 calendar days from the date the reconsideration or clarification is received to request an appeal of the Office of Inspector General's finding. Provides that within 30 calendar days after submitting the appeal request, the agency, victim or guardian, or the subject employee shall have the right to request an administrative hearing before an administrative law judge. Provides that the determination of the administrative law judge shall be considered a final administrative decision subject to judicial review. Requires the Department to adopt rules governing the practice and procedure in the administrative hearings.
Title
DHS-INVESTIGATIVE RPTS-APPEALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0943 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |