IL SB3237 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. In provisions concerning investigative reports and findings issued by the Department of Human Services' Office of the Inspector General concerning abuse allegations involving Department employees and clients, provides that any request for reconsideration or clarification of the Inspector General's findings shall be conducted by an investigator or supervisor who did not participate in the investigation for which reconsideration or clarification is sought. Provides that after a reconsideration has been completed, the agency, victim or guardian, or the subject employee has 30 calendar days from the date the reconsideration or clarification is received to request an appeal of the Office of Inspector General's finding. Provides that within 30 calendar days after submitting the appeal request, the agency, victim or guardian, or the subject employee shall have the right to request an administrative hearing before an administrative law judge. Provides that the determination of the administrative law judge shall be considered a final administrative decision subject to judicial review. Requires the Department to adopt rules governing the practice and procedure in the administrative hearings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-INVESTIGATIVE RPTS-APPEALS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013051-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback