IL SB3233 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Intergovernmental Cooperation Act. Provides that no intergovernmental or interagency agreement or contract may be entered into, implemented, or given effect if the agreement's or contract's intent or effect is, among other requirements, to circumvent any limitation established by law pertaining to payroll certification under the State Finance Act or to authorize the payment of employees of the Office of the Governor out of appropriations other than those established for that purpose. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that, for the Office of the Governor, the certification on every State payroll voucher shall be required for expenditures from amounts appropriated to the Office of the Governor for payment of salaries of Governor's Office employees and executed by the Governor, or his or her designee, in addition to any other certifications or approvals which may be required by law to be made. Provides that in no event shall salaries of employees of the Office of the Governor be paid from appropriations other than those established for that purpose. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPTROLLER-PAYROLL CERTIFY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2018-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301059.03Amended CodeCitation Text
52204.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback