IL SB3232 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Creates a 5-year demonstration project within the Department of Human Services to provide an intensive workforce training program for entry level workers and a multi-generational healthy family initiative. Provides that the demonstration project shall be privately funded and shall be operated and maintained by a non-profit, community-based entity that shall provide wages earned by participants enrolled in the workforce training program as well as support services to families enrolled in the multi-generational healthy family initiative. Limits the number of participants in the demonstration to 500 and provides that participants shall qualify to have whatever financial assistance they receive from their participation in the demonstration excluded from consideration for purposes of determining eligibility for or the amount of assistance under the Code. Requires the selected community-based entity to comply with all applicable State and federal requirements and to develop and implement a research component to determine the effectiveness of the demonstration project in promoting and instilling self-sufficiency through its intensive workforce training program and multi-generational healthy family initiative. Contains provisions on reporting requirements and other matters.
Title
PUB AID-WORKFORCE TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0806 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 1-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |