IL SB3232 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Creates a 5-year demonstration project within the Department of Human Services to provide an intensive workforce training program for entry level workers and a multi-generational healthy family initiative. Provides that the demonstration project shall be privately funded and shall be operated and maintained by a non-profit, community-based entity that shall provide wages earned by participants enrolled in the workforce training program as well as support services to families enrolled in the multi-generational healthy family initiative. Limits the number of participants in the demonstration to 500 and provides that participants shall qualify to have whatever financial assistance they receive from their participation in the demonstration excluded from consideration for purposes of determining eligibility for or the amount of assistance under the Code. Requires the selected community-based entity to comply with all applicable State and federal requirements and to develop and implement a research component to determine the effectiveness of the demonstration project in promoting and instilling self-sufficiency through its intensive workforce training program and multi-generational healthy family initiative. Contains provisions on reporting requirements and other matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUB AID-WORKFORCE TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose
2018-04-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30551-7Amended CodeCitation Text
305512-4.51New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback