IL SB3230 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Hydraulic Fracturing Tax Act. Removes a provision that provides for a different tax calculation for the first 24 months of oil and gas production.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FRACKING TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-13SenateSession Sine Die
2014-04-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2014-04-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2014-04-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2014-03-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014
2014-03-27SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN)
2014-02-19SenateAssigned to Energy
2014-02-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-02-11SenateFirst Reading
2014-02-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
354502-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback