IL SB3228 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a person under 21 years of age at the time of the commission of an offense, other than first degree murder, and who is not serving a sentence for first degree murder and who is sentenced on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be eligible for parole review by the Prisoner Review Board after serving 10 years or more of his or her sentence, except for those serving a sentence for: (1) aggravated criminal sexual assault who shall be eligible for parole review by the Prisoner Review Board after serving 20 years or more of his or her sentence or; (2) predatory criminal sexual assault of a child who shall not be eligible for parole review by the Prisoner Review Board. Provides that a person under 21 years of age at the time of the commission of first degree murder who is sentenced on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be eligible for parole review by the Prisoner Review Board after serving 20 years or more of his or her sentence, except for those subject to a term of natural life imprisonment or any person subject to sentencing for certain types of first degree murder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CORRECTIONS-YOUTHFUL PAROLE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-002-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-3-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-3-2Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-3-9Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-111New CodeSee Bill Text
73055-4.5-20Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-25Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-30Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-8-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback