IL SB3225 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Act. Provides that the Governor is authorized and requested to issue a proclamation on Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Day which discusses the history of persons with disabilities in the State (rather than only comments upon the necessity for and significance of the Pedestrians with Disabilities Act and laws protecting pedestrians with disabilities) Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOV: SAFETY DAY PROCLAMATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 004-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6256020Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback