IL SB3225 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Act. Provides that the Governor is authorized and requested to issue a proclamation on Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Day which discusses the history of persons with disabilities in the State (rather than only comments upon the necessity for and significance of the Pedestrians with Disabilities Act and discusses the history of laws protecting pedestrians with disabilities) Effective immediately.
Title
GOV: SAFETY DAY PROCLAMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 60 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |